VA HB1929 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Public Procurement Act; price matching by Virginia businesses. Provides that whenever the lowest responsive and responsible bidder is a resident of any other state and such state allows a resident contractor of that state a price-matching preference, then a like preference shall be allowed to responsive and responsible bidders who are residents of Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Procurement Act; price matching by State's businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343)
2011-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 343 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-02-28 Senate: Signed by President
2011-02-26 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-02-25 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1929ER)
2011-02-25 House: Enrolled
2011-02-21 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-21 Senate: Read third time
2011-02-18 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-16 Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N)
2011-02-09 Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2011-02-09 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2011-02-08 House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2011-02-08 House: Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2011-02-07 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1929H1
2011-02-07 House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104910D-H1
2011-02-07 House: Read second time
2011-02-06 House: Read first time
2011-02-04 House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 1-N)
2011-02-04 House: Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight and Government Activities
2011-02-03 House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2011-02-03 House: Committee substitute printed 11104910D-H1
2011-02-03 House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2011-02-03 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
2011-01-17 House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
2011-01-11 House: Referred to Committee on General Laws
2011-01-11 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100964D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221111(n/a)See Bill Text
224324(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1929
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1929+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1929H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1929ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+CHAP0343+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H1102V0025+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H11V0120+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H02V0049+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV0709+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+S12V0176+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0549HB1929+HB1929
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0570HB1929+HB1929

Bill Comments 750

feedback