VA HB1927 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1927ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1927ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development authorities; Fairfax County. Allows Fairfax County to appoint nine, rather than seven, commissioners to the economic development authority.
Title
Economic development authorities; Fairfax County.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1927ER) |
2021-02-08 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-15 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102409D |