VA HB1927 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Official emblems and designations; "Song of the Mountains"; state television series. Designates "Song of the Mountains" as the state television series. This bill is identical to SB 1332.
Title
"Song of the Mountains"; designating as state television series.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 15 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1927ER) |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101177D |