VA HB1927 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency medical services personnel; penalty for assault and battery. Adds emergency medical services personnel members who are employed by or volunteers of an emergency medical services agency and engaged in the performance of their public duties to the list of individuals of whom assault and battery may be a Class 6 felony with a six-month mandatory minimum sentence.
Title
Assault and battery; adds volunteer firefighter or any emergency medical service personnel, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Rick Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N) (Y: 5 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N) (Y: 5 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698) | |
2013-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 698 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1927ER) |
2013-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Delegates: Morris, Lingamfelter, Lopez |
2013-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Reeves, Garrett, Marsh |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (5-Y 92-N) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 13101984D-E |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1927E |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101984D |