VA HB1926 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control (ABC); definition of municipal golf course; food sales requirements for mixed beverage restaurant licensees located on the premises of and operated by municipal golf courses. Defines "municipal golf course" and provides that for mixed beverage restaurant licensees located on the premises of and operated by municipal golf courses, the ABC Board shall recognize the seasonal nature of the business and waive any applicable monthly food sales requirements for those months when weather conditions may reduce patronage of the golf course, provided that prepared food, including meals, is available to patrons during the same months. The bill provides that the gross receipts from the sale of food cooked, or prepared, and consumed on the premises and nonalcoholic beverages served on the premises, after the issuance of such license, shall amount to at least 45 percent of the gross receipts from the sale of mixed beverages and food on an annualized basis.
Title
ABC; definition of municipal golf course, food sales exemptions.
Sponsors
Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] |
Del. Israel O'Quinn [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 9-N) (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N) (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N) (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 585 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1926ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (85-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2017-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-23 | House | Delegates: Campbell, Knight, McQuinn |
2017-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senators: Cosgrove, Wexton, DeSteph |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2017-02-16 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 96-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (87-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1926H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104790D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104790D-H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101169D |