VA HB1925 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1925
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0141)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0141)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Brownfield and Coal Mine Renewable Energy Grant Fund and Program; handbook. Establishes the Virginia Brownfield and Coal Mine Renewable Energy Grant Fund and Program (the Fund and Program). The bill provides that no allocation of funds shall be made to the Fund or Program unless federal funds are available to cover the cost of such allocation. The Fund and Program shall be administered by the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy for the purpose of awarding grants to renewable energy projects that are located on brownfields or previously coal mined lands, both defined in the bill. Grants are to be awarded on a basis of $500 per kilowatt of nameplate capacity from renewable energy sources that are located on previously coal mined lands and $100 per kilowatt of nameplate capacity from renewable energy sources that are located on brownfields. Virginia Brownfield and Coal Mine Renewable Energy Grant Fund and Program; handbook. Establishes the Virginia Brownfield and Coal Mine Renewable Energy Grant Fund and Program (the Fund and Program). The bill provides that no allocation of funds shall be made to the Fund or Program unless federal funds are available to cover the cost of such allocation. The Fund and Program shall be administered by the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy for the purpose of awarding grants to renewable energy projects that are located on brownfields or previously coal mined lands, both defined in the bill. Grants are to be awarded on a basis of $500 per kilowatt of nameplate capacity from renewable energy sources that are located on previously coal mined lands and $100 per kilowatt of nameplate capacity from renewable energy sources that are located on brownfields. No more than $10 million shall be awarded to any previously coal mined lands project and no more than $5 million to any single brownfield project. No more than $35 million shall be allocated per year by the grant program. Of the $35 million, $20 million shall be reserved for previously coal mined lands projects. If less than $20 million is distributed to such projects, the remaining funds may be reallocated to brownfield projects. The bill also provides that the Department shall, in consultation with stakeholders, develop a handbook for renewable energy and energy storage development on brownfields and previously coal mined lands. Finally, the bill requires the Department to submit an annual report regarding administration of the Fund and Program to the General Assembly. However, the annual report shall not be required if the Fund and Program are not funded.
Title
Virginia Brownfield and Coal Mine Renewable Energy Grant Fund and Program; established, report.
Sponsors
Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. William Wampler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0141) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 141 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1925ER) |
2021-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2021-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102691D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1925 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)