VA HB1923 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virtual Virginia; availability. Requires that the Virtual Virginia program, established by the Department of Education, be made available to all public middle and high schools. The bill provides that such program may be made available to all public elementary schools. Under current law, Virtual Virginia is required to be made available to public high schools only. The bill also replaces the term "statewide electronic classroom" with "online learning program" to more accurately reflect the Virtual Virginia program.
Title
Virtual Virginia; availability to all public middle and high schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Del. Daun Hester [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported from Education (18-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101288D |