VA HB1921 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1921
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Assistance for certain voters; curbside voting. Clarifies that any voter with a permanent physical disability, temporary physical disability, or injury is entitled to vote outside of the polling place. The bill further provides that during a declared state of emergency related to a communicable disease of public health threat, any voter shall be entitled to vote outside of the polling place. The bill requires that the area designated for voting outside of the polling place be clearly marked and instructions on how the voter is to notify an officer of election of his request to vote outside of the polling place be prominently displayed. The bill makes technical amendments for clarity and organizational purposes.
Title
Assistance for certain voters; curbside voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Election Administration |
2021-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101908D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1921 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 638 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 646.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 649 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 649.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |