VA HB1920 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Suspension or modification of sentence; transfer to the Department of Corrections. Provides that if a person has been sentenced for a felony to the Department of Corrections (the Department), the court that heard the case, if it appears compatible with the public interest and there are circumstances in mitigation of the offense, may, at any time before the person is transferred to the Department or regardless of whether the person has been transferred to the Department, at any time within 12 months of entry of the sentencing order, suspend or otherwise modify the unserved portion of such a sentence. Additionally, notwithstanding the foregoing, the bill provides that for good cause shown and in the interest of justice the court may, at any time before the sentence has been completely served, suspend the unserved portion of any such sentence, place the person on probation for such time as the court shall determine, or otherwise modify the sentence imposed. Current law allows such suspension or modification of the unserved portion of a sentence only if the person has not yet been transferred to the Department of Corrections.
Title
Suspension or modification of sentence; transfer to the Department of Corrections.
Sponsors
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2021-01-15 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101528D |