VA HB1917 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Corrections; health care continuous quality improvement committee. Requires the Director of the Department of Corrections to establish a health care continuous quality improvement committee, consisting of the Director and specified health care professionals employed by the Department. The bill requires the committee to (i) identify appropriate criteria for evaluation of the quality of health care services provided by the Department, (ii) monitor and evaluate the quality of health care services provided by the Department utilizing the criteria identified, and (iii) develop strategies to improve the quality of health care services provided by the Department. The bill also requires the committee to publish quarterly continuous quality improvement reports setting forth such data and information as the committee deems appropriate on a website maintained by the Department. As introduced, this bill is a recommendation of the Joint Commission on Health Care. This bill is identical to SB1273.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOC; Director to establish health care continuous quality improvement committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 463 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1917ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenators: Lucas, DeSteph, Black
2019-02-20SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-19HouseDelegates: Stolle, Orrock, Aird
2019-02-19HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-19HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-18SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-18SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
2019-02-14HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 98-N)
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-12SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-12SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-12SenateRead third time
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1917H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104827D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104827D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101421D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53112(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1917
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1917+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1917H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1917ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0463+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1202V0021+HB1917
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0064+HB1917
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2142+HB1917
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2216+HB1917
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0090+HB1917
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB1917+HB1917
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0520HB1917+HB1917
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2828+HB1917
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0732HB1917+HB1917
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3240+HB1917
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1030HB1917+HB1917

Bill Comments

feedback