VA HB1915 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Teacher compensation; at or above national average. Requires that public school teachers be compensated at a rate that is at or above the national average. Under current law, compensation at such rate is aspirational. The bill requires state funding to be provided pursuant to the general appropriation act in a sum sufficient to fund a 4.5 percent annual increase for public school teacher salaries, effective from the 2022-23 school year through the 2026-27 school year. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers; required to be compensated at or above national average.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Appropriations
2021-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-18HouseReported from Education (19-Y 3-N)
2021-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2021-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102475D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221289.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback