VA HB1914 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Corrections; operations and costs. Establishes a formula for determining the estimated appropriations in a fiscal impact statement of any bill that adds a new felony for which imprisonment or commitment is authorized. The bill also provides that the cost of goods and services sold in stores in state correctional facilities shall not exceed 10 percent of the cost of the typical market rate for such goods and services in major retail stores that are not affiliated with any correctional facility and that the Department shall not receive any commissions or markups from the goods and services sold.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections, Department of; operations and costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Public Safety
2023-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2023-01-24HouseAssigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102470D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53127(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback