VA HB1914 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1914
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; period costs. Provides that in a triennial review proceeding, certain utility generation and distribution costs that are not proposed for recovery under various cost recovery mechanisms, at the State Corporation Commission's discretion, may be attributed to the test periods under review and deemed fully recovered or, if the utility has earned below a certain threshold, may be deferred for recovery over future periods. Under current law, such attribution is required unless the utility has earned below a certain threshold, in which case deferred recovery of the costs is required. The bill also eliminates provisions that limit any rate reduction ordered by the State Corporation Commission in the first triennial review of Dominion Energy Virginia after January 1, 2021, to $50 million in annual revenues and provides that in any triennial review, regardless of whether the Commission has ordered bill credits, the utility earned above its authorized rate of return during the test period under review, or the utility has made a request regarding any customer credit reinvestment offsets, the Commission may order any rate reduction it deems necessary and appropriate unless it finds that the resulting rates will not provide the utility with the opportunity to (i) fully recover its costs of providing its services and (ii) earn not less than a fair combined rate of return on its generation and distribution services. The provisions of the bill apply to the first triennial review of Dominion Energy Virginia conducted after January 1, 2021.
Title
Electric utilities; triennial review, period costs, rate reductions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (60-Y 39-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1914H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104073D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Incorporates HB1835 (Subramanyam) |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104073D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2021-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101429D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1914 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
HB1835 (Similar To) 2021-02-02 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
HB1835 (Similar To) 2021-02-02 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
HB1835 (Similar To) 2021-02-02 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
HB1835 (Similar To) 2021-02-02 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce