VA HB1914 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requirements for issuing prescriptions; exceptions for public health practitioners. Authorizes practitioners contracted by the Department of Health and practitioners employed or contracted by a local health department to prescribe antibiotic therapy to the sexual partner of a patient diagnosed with a sexually transmitted disease without the physical examination normally required. Under current law, only employees of the Department of Health are so authorized. Additionally, the bill authorizes a practitioner, who is an employee of or contracted by the Department of Health or a local health department, to prescribe Schedule VI antibiotics and antiviral agents to other persons in close contact with a diagnosed patient without a bona-fide practitioner-patient relationship with the diagnosed patient when emergency treatment is necessary to prevent imminent risk of death, life-threatening illness, or serious disability.
Title
Public health practitioners; requirements for issuing prescriptions, exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335) | |
2019-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 335 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1914ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101794D |