VA HB1914 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elected and appointed school board members; criminal Elected and appointed school board members; criminal history record information and child abuse and neglect data. Requires each individual who is elected or appointed to a school board to (i) submit to fingerprinting and provide personal descriptive information to be forwarded along with his fingerprints by the school board through the Central Criminal Records Exchange to the Federal Bureau of Investigation for the purpose of obtaining criminal history record information and (ii) provide written consent and the necessary personal information for the school board to obtain a search of the registry of founded complaints of child abuse and neglect maintained by the Department of Social Services and to take reasonable steps to obtain information from each state in which the individual has resided within the prior five years to determine whether such individual is the subject of a founded complaint of child abuse and neglect in any such state. The bill precludes any individual who is found to have been (a) convicted of a felony or any offense involving the sexual molestation, physical or sexual abuse, or rape of a child in the Commonwealth or an equivalent offense in another state or (b) the subject of a founded complaint of child abuse and neglect in the Commonwealth or another state from serving on any school board. The bill requires each entity that administers the school board election or appointment process for each local school division to notify each prospective school board
Title
School board members; criminal background checks.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-30 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102429D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1914 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1914+hil |