VA HB1912 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; net energy metering. Increases, from 500 kilowatts to two megawatts, the maximum generating capacity of an electrical generating facility owned or operated by an electric utility's nonresidential customer that may be eligible for participation in the utility's net energy metering program. This change to the definition of an "eligible customer-generator" also affects the definition of a "qualified energy project" as used in the Virginia Small Business Financing Act.
Title
Electric utilities; net energy metering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102830D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1912 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1912+hil |