VA HB1912 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Petition for child custody or visitation. Provides that issues of child custody or visitation may be included in a single petition in juvenile and domestic relations district court, and that such issues may be included in a single petition involving two or more children, if such children have the same parents or legal guardians. The bill also provides that if a person, agency, or institution is authorized to inspect the case files relating to any juvenile subject to such a petition, the person, agency, or institution may inspect the entire case file related to the petition. The bill further provides that the court records in a case where a single petition for multiple children has been filed will be expunged after the youngest child subject to the petition has reached 19 years of age and five years have elapsed since the last hearing in the case.
Title
Child custody or visitation; issues may be included in single petition in JDRDC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2013-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100084D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |