VA HB1910 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Creation of regional transportation authorities. Authorizes two or more adjacent counties or cities to form a regional transportation authority to engage in regional transportation projects. The bill sets forth the procedures for forming such authority and determining the membership of its governing board. Ordinances adopted by each member of such authority would set forth the local taxes, fees, and revenues to be contributed by each locality to such authority.
Title
Regional transportation authorities; creation.
Sponsors
Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2021-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100751D |