VA HB1909 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibition of sale, transfer, etc., of certain firearms magazines; fine. Provides that any person, corporation, or other entity that manufactures, imports, possesses, purchases, sells, or transfers any large capacity magazine shall be subject to a $250 fine. The bill provides for exceptions to the prohibition, including the owner's registration with the Department of State Police following a criminal history record information check. The willful or intentional making of a materially false statement on the consent form required by the processes required for a criminal history record information check will subject the person making such statement to a $250 fine. The bill also provides that a registrant is limited to three large capacity magazines and must otherwise dispose of all magazines in excess of the limit. Finally, the bill outlines the registration process for anyone who owns a large capacity magazine.
Title
Firearms magazines, certain; prohibition of sale, transfer, etc., penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102322D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1909 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1909+hil |