VA HB1909 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Certain school board property; establishment of gun-free zone permitted. Permits any school board to deem any non-school zone property that it owns or leases as a gun-free zone and prohibit any individual from knowingly possessing, purchasing, transferring, carrying, storing, or transporting firearms, ammunition, or components or combination thereof while such individual is upon such property, except certain individuals such as law-enforcement officers and qualified retired law-enforcement officers. Certain school board property; establishment of gun-free zone permitted. Permits any school board to deem any non-school zone property that it owns or leases as a gun-free zone and prohibit any individual from knowingly possessing, purchasing, transferring, carrying, storing, or transporting firearms, ammunition, or components or combination thereof while such individual is upon such property, except certain individuals such as law-enforcement officers and qualified retired law-enforcement officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School board property, certain; establishment of gun-free zone permitted.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-27HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
2021-01-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1909H1
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103262D-H1
2021-01-26HouseRead second time
2021-01-25HouseRead first time
2021-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103262D-H1
2021-01-22HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2021-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2021-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100496D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221131.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1909
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1909+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1909H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103262D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103262.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1909F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1909FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1501V0003+HB1909
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H15V0006+HB1909
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1195+HB1909
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0096+HB1909

Bill Comments 750

feedback