VA HB1906 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Marijuana; decriminalization of simple marijuana possession. Decriminalizes marijuana possession and provides a civil penalty of no more than $250 for a first violation and $1,000 for a second or subsequent violation. Under current law, a first offense is punishable by a maximum fine of $500 and a maximum 30-day jail sentence, and subsequent offenses are a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill creates a rebuttable presumption that a person who possesses no more than one-half ounce of marijuana possesses it for personal use and provides that the existing suspended sentence and substance abuse screening provisions apply only to criminal violations or to civil violations by a minor. The bill decreases the penalty for distribution or possession with intent to sell more than one-half but not more than five pounds of marijuana from a Class 5 felony to a Class 6 felony.
Title
Marijuana; decriminalization of simple marijuana possession.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102658D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 250.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 252 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 259.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 287.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 390.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1906 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1906+hil |