VA HB1905 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1905
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic education and financial literacy required in middle and high school grades; employment arrangements. Adds to objectives developed and approved by the Board of Education for economics education and financial literacy at the middle and high school levels the implications of various employment arrangements with regard to benefits, protections, and long-term financial sustainability. Employment arrangements is defined in the bill as full-time employment, part-time employment, independent contract work, gig work, piece work, contingent work, day labor work, freelance work, and 1099 work.
Title
Economic education and financial literacy required in middle and high school grades; employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 25 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 26, 2021 | |
2021-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1905ER) |
2021-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102521D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1905 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)