VA HB1905 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage referendum; exception. Provides that, notwithstanding the requirement for a referendum for liquor by the drink, the Board of Directors of the Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority may issue a mixed beverage license to establishments located (i) on property fronting Doe Creek Farm Road, located approximately 1,310 feet southeast of the intersection of State Route 613 and Doe Creek Farm Road, and listed on the National Registry of Historic Places, (ii) on property adjacent to the southeast side of the intersection of Route 58 Alternate and Skaggs Hill Road within the boundary of any town incorporated in 1891, (iii) on property along River Bend Drive and 805 feet directly north of Route 58 Alternate within the boundary of any town incorporated in 1891, and (iv) on property fronting the north side of Mullins Avenue to the west of the intersection of Mullins Avenue and Chase Street and located in a town incorporated in 1884.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage referendum, exception.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 6-N) (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
2019-02-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 175 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1905ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
2019-02-12SenateRead third time
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 2-N)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-23HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 6-N)
2019-01-23HouseRead third time and passed House (89-Y 6-N)
2019-01-22HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1905H1
2019-01-22HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105157D-H1
2019-01-22HouseRead second time
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-17HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105157D-H1
2019-01-17HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101849D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41126(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1905
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1905+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1905H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1905ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0175+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0005+HB1905
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0045+HB1905
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1799+HB1905
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0093+HB1905
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB1905+HB1905
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0529HB1905+HB1905

Bill Comments

feedback