VA HB1903 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Local government authority; reduction of speed limits. Authorizes local governing bodies to reduce the speed limit to less than 25 miles per hour, but not less than 15 miles per hour, in a business district or residence district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government; authority to reduce the speed limit in a business district or residence district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-19HouseVOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead third time and passed House (93-Y 6-N)
2021-01-18HouseEngrossed by House
2021-01-18HouseEngrossment reconsidered by House
2021-01-18HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-15HouseRead first time
2021-01-14HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101800D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621300(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback