VA HB1903 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State Air Pollution Control Board; membership. Exempts the receipt of income from a state-supported institution of higher education that is subject to permits or enforcement orders of the State Air Pollution Control Board (the Board) from the reasons to disqualify a person from appointment to the Board. Under current law, the only income a member may receive from an entity subject to permits or enforcement orders of the Board is income from a vested retirement benefit.
Title
State Air Pollution Control Board; membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-04 | House | Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101421D |