VA HB1903 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Cellular phone used as tracking device. Provides that a cellular phone is a tracking device when it is used to track the movement of a person, and that such use requires a warrant issued by a judicial officer.
Title
Cellular phone; use as tracking device.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2013-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102780D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1903 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1903+hil |