VA HB1902 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1902
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Expanded polystyrene food service containers; prohibition; civil penalty. Prohibits the dispensing by a food vendor of prepared food to a customer in a single-use expanded polystyrene food service container, as defined in the bill. The bill requires certain chain restaurants to stop using such containers by July 1, 2023, and sets the date for compliance by all food vendors as July 1, 2025. The bill exempts nonprofit organizations from the definition of "food vendor" and provides a process by which a locality may grant consecutive one-year exemptions to individual food vendors on the basis of undue economic hardship. The bill provides a civil penalty of not more than $50 for each day of violation, to be collected in a civil action brought by the Attorney General or the relevant locality. The penalties collected are to be deposited in the Litter Control and Recycling Fund or to the treasury of the relevant locality, as appropriate. A portion of the penalties deposited in the Fund are to be used for public information campaigns to discourage the sale and use of expanded polystyrene products. Finally, the bill directs the Department of Environmental Quality to post to its website information on compliance and the filing of complaints. This bill is a reenactment of Chapter 1104 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020. Expanded polystyrene food service containers; prohibition; civil penalty. Prohibits the dispensing by a food vendor of prepared food to a customer in a single-use expanded polystyrene food service container, as defined in the bill. The bill requires certain chain restaurants to stop using such containers by July 1, 2023, and sets the date for compliance by all food vendors as July 1, 2025. The bill exempts nonprofit organizations from the definition of "food vendor" and provides a process by which a locality may grant consecutive one-year exemptions to individual food vendors on the basis of undue economic hardship. The bill provides a civil penalty of not more than $50 for each day of violation, to be collected in a civil action brought by the Attorney General or the relevant locality. The penalties collected are to be deposited in the Litter Control and Recycling Fund or to the treasury of the relevant locality, as appropriate. A portion of the penalties deposited in the Fund are to be used for public information campaigns to discourage the sale and use of expanded polystyrene products. Finally, the bill directs the Department of Environmental Quality to post to its website information on compliance and the filing of complaints. This bill is a reenactment of Chapter 1104 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020.
Title
Expanded polystyrene food service containers; prohibition, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-19 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 40-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Printed as engrossed 21100816D-E |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1902E |
2021-01-18 | House | Amendment by Delegate Carr agreed to |
2021-01-18 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-13 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100816D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1902 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1422.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1424.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |