VA HB1902 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Stalking; early termination of rental agreements; penalty. Provides that the conduct necessary to sustain a conviction for stalking includes conduct by any action, method, device, or means. The bill also provides that a tenant who is a victim of stalking may terminate the tenant's rental agreement if the tenant has obtained a protective order or the perpetrator of the crime has been convicted.
Title
Stalking; early termination of rental agreements, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101420D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1902 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1902+hil |