VA HB1901 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-29 - Tabled in General Laws (10-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Property Owners' Association Act; rights of lot owners. Requires a property owners' association to provide the count and final outcome of a vote on any matter requiring a vote by the association's membership to any lot owner who requests such information. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Property Owners' Association Act; rights of lot owners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House: Tabled in General Laws (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29HouseTabled in General Laws (10-Y 9-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101163D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback