VA HB1901 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; tied house exception. Creates an exception to the tied house prohibition on the retail sale of alcoholic beverages by manufacturers of distilled spirits for any manufacturer of distilled spirits located within the Commonwealth, not under common control or ownership with any other distillery, that is under common control or ownership with a restaurant licensed to sell spirits at retail in Virginia, provided that such manufacturer produces no more than 5,000 gallons of spirits annually and does not require the retail licensee to exclude from sale at the restaurant alcoholic beverages of other manufacturers, bottlers, or wholesalers. The bill would allow the issuance of a retail license to such manufacturer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; tied house exception.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-08HouseLeft in General Laws
2017-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote
2017-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100419D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41215(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback