VA HB1901 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0439)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; definition of small business. Changes the definition of small business to require the business, together with affiliates, to meet the small business size standards established by the regulations of the U.S. Small Business Administration. Currently, a small business is required to have 250 or fewer employees or average annual gross receipts of $10 million or less averaged over the previous three years. The bill requires the Secretary of Commerce and Trade to convene a workgroup of interested stakeholders to examine the definition of small business in the Code of Virginia and report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015. The bill will not become effective unless reenacted by the 2016 Session of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business and Supplier Diversity, Department of; clarifies definition of small business.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0439)
2015-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 439 (effective - see bill)
2015-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-03-10HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
2015-03-07SenateSigned by President
2015-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-03-06HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1901ER)
2015-03-06HouseEnrolled
2015-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2015-02-26HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
2015-02-26HouseConference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2015-02-26 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2015-02-25SenateSenators: Petersen, Stuart, Garrett
2015-02-25SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2015-02-25HouseDelegates: Lopez, Gilbert, Knight
2015-02-25HouseConferees appointed by House
2015-02-25HouseHouse acceded to request
2015-02-24SenateSenate requested conference committee
2015-02-24SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2015-02-23HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
2015-02-23HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 15105131D-S1 (2-Y 96-N)
2015-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-02-19SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1901S1
2015-02-19SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 15105131D-S1
2015-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2015-02-19SenateRead third time
2015-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 15105131D-S1
2015-02-16SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2015-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2015-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2015-02-10HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2015-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2015-02-09HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1901H1
2015-02-09HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 15104602D-H1
2015-02-09HouseRead second time
2015-02-07HouseRead first time
2015-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 15104602D-H1
2015-02-05HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2015-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
2015-01-20HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2015-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2015-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100636D

Same As/Similar To

SB885 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0441)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221604(n/a)See Bill Text
224310(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1901
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1901+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1901H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1901S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1901ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0439+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H1102V0023+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H11V0117+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2073+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S12V0111+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0559HB1901+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0615HB1901+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2632+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0752HB1901+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2874+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0986HB1901+HB1901

Bill Comments 750

feedback