VA HB1901 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Fines under certain local ordinances paid to local school division and Literary Fund. Provides that fines imposed under certain local ordinances dealing with DUI, disposition of children in juvenile and domestic relations district courts, and appropriate provisions of Title 46.2, when those ordinances incorporate Code of Virginia provisions, are to be paid to the school division of the locality in which the fines were imposed and into the state treasury to the credit of the Literary Fund in the proportions as follows: beginning July 1, 2013, and through June 30, 2014, 67 percent to the local school division and 33 percent to the Literary Fund; beginning July 1, 2014, and through June 30, 2015, 33 percent to the local school division and 67 percent to the Literary Fund; and beginning July 1, 2015, 100 percent to the Literary Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fines under certain local ordinances; paid to local school division and Literary Fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2013-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2013-01-11HouseAssigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
2013-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2013-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102702D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16169.48(n/a)See Bill Text
4621308(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback