VA HB1901 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; prohibited sale of prepackaged alcoholic beverages containing caffeine. Prohibits the sale of prepackaged alcoholic beverages containing caffeine; exception for mixed beverage licensees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; prohibited sale of prepackaged alcoholic beverages containing caffeine.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-01 House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote
2011-01-27 House: Subcommittee recommends passing by with letter by voice vote
2011-01-17 House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
2011-01-11 House: Referred to Committee on General Laws
2011-01-11 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101415D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41100(n/a)See Bill Text
41103(n/a)See Bill Text
41111(n/a)See Bill Text
41119(n/a)See Bill Text
41324(n/a)See Bill Text
41325(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback