VA HB1900 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1900

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0403)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant remedies for exclusion from dwelling unit, interruption of services, or actions taken to make premises unsafe. Provides that a general district court shall enter an order upon petition by a tenant that his landlord has (i) removed or excluded the tenant from the dwelling unit unlawfully, (ii) interrupted or caused the interruption of an essential service to the tenant, or (iii) taken action to make the premises unsafe for habitation. The bill allows entry of a preliminary order ex parte to require the landlord to allow the tenant to recover possession of the dwelling unit, resume any such interrupted essential service, or fix any willful actions taken by the landlord or his agent to make the premises unsafe for habitation if there is good cause to do so and the tenant made reasonable efforts to notify the landlord of the hearing. The bill requires that any ex parte order entered shall further indicate a date for a full hearing on the petition that is no later than 10 days from the initial hearing date. Finally, the bill provides that, at a full hearing on such petition and upon proper evidence presented, the tenant shall recover actual damages, the greater of $5,000 or four months' rent, and reasonable attorney fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant remedies for exclusion from dwelling unit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0403)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 403 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1900ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 19-N)
2021-02-27SenatePassed by temporarily
2021-02-27HouseVOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 45-N)
2021-02-27HouseConference report agreed to by House (54-Y 45-N)
2021-02-27 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2021-02-25SenateSenators: Locke, Petersen, McClellan
2021-02-25SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2021-02-25HouseDelegates: Hudson, Simon, Fowler
2021-02-25HouseConferees appointed by House
2021-02-25HouseHouse acceded to request
2021-02-25SenateSenate requested conference committee
2021-02-25SenateSenate insisted on amendment (35-Y 2-N)
2021-02-24HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
2021-02-24HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 97-N)
2021-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-23SenatePassed Senate with amendment (21-Y 18-N)
2021-02-23SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2021-02-23SenateAmendment by Senator Petersen agreed to
2021-02-23SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-23SenateRead third time
2021-02-22SenatePassed by for the day
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 5-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-22HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N)
2021-01-21HousePrinted as engrossed 21102519D-E
2021-01-21HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1900E
2021-01-21HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-21HouseRead second time
2021-01-20HouseRead first time
2021-01-19HouseReported from General Laws with amendment(s) (13-Y 8-N)
2021-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102519D

Same As/Similar To

HB1900 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
SB1215 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404)
SB1215 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511243(n/a)See Bill Text
5511243.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1900
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1900+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1900E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1900ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0403+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1900AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1900AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1900ASE
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1900AC
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1900F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1900FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1900FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1102C0005+HB1900
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11C0031+HB1900
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1009+HB1900
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0122+HB1900
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12V0052+HB1900
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB1900+HB1900
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0356HB1900+HB1900
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1934+HB1900
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0423HB1900+HB1900
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV2005+HB1900
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0559HB1900+HB1900

Bill Comments

feedback