VA HB1900 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1900
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant remedies for exclusion from dwelling unit, interruption of services, or actions taken to make premises unsafe. Provides that a general district court shall enter an order upon petition by a tenant that his landlord has (i) removed or excluded the tenant from the dwelling unit unlawfully, (ii) interrupted or caused the interruption of an essential service to the tenant, or (iii) taken action to make the premises unsafe for habitation. The bill allows entry of a preliminary order ex parte to require the landlord to allow the tenant to recover possession of the dwelling unit, resume any such interrupted essential service, or fix any willful actions taken by the landlord or his agent to make the premises unsafe for habitation if there is good cause to do so and the tenant made reasonable efforts to notify the landlord of the hearing. The bill requires that any ex parte order entered shall further indicate a date for a full hearing on the petition that is no later than 10 days from the initial hearing date. Finally, the bill provides that, at a full hearing on such petition, the tenant shall recover actual damages, the greater of $5,000 or four months' rent, and reasonable attorney fees. Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant remedies for exclusion from dwelling unit, interruption of services, or actions taken to make premises unsafe. Provides that a general district court shall enter an order upon petition by a tenant that his landlord has (i) removed or excluded the tenant from the dwelling unit unlawfully, (ii) interrupted or caused the interruption of an essential service to the tenant, or (iii) taken action to make the premises unsafe for habitation. The bill allows entry of a preliminary order ex parte to require the landlord to allow the tenant to recover possession of the dwelling unit, resume any such interrupted essential service, or fix any willful actions taken by the landlord or his agent to make the premises unsafe for habitation if there is good cause to do so and the tenant made reasonable efforts to notify the landlord of the hearing. The bill requires that any ex parte order entered shall further indicate a date for a full hearing on the petition that is no later than 10 days from the initial hearing date. Finally, the bill provides that, at a full hearing on such petition, the tenant shall recover actual damages, the greater of $5,000 or four months' rent, and reasonable attorney fees.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant remedies for exclusion from dwelling unit.
Sponsors
Del. Sally Hudson [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102519D-E |
2021-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1900E |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102519D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1900 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 1 | 1243 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1243.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |