VA HB1898 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Limits on prescription of controlled substances containing opioids. Prohibits a prescriber providing treatment for a patient in an emergency department of a corporation, facility, or institution licensed, owned, or operated by the Commonwealth to provide health care from prescribing a controlled substance containing an opioid in a quantity greater than a three-day supply, as determined in accordance with the prescriber's directions for use. The bill also prohibits a pharmacist from dispensing a controlled substance containing an opioid pursuant to a prescription issued by a prescriber providing treatment to a patient in the emergency department of a corporation, facility, or institution licensed, owned, or operated by the Commonwealth to provide health care unless the prescription complies with the requirements of the bill. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2020.
Title
Controlled substances; limits on prescription containing opioids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101420D |
Subjects
Controlled Substances
Narcotics and Drugs
Opiates and Opioids
Pharmacists
Prescription Medicines
Professions and Occupations
Narcotics and Drugs
Opiates and Opioids
Pharmacists
Prescription Medicines
Professions and Occupations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3408.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1898 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1898+hil |