VA HB1898 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Abduction; forced labor or services. Provides that abduction of any person for the purpose of prostitution or of a minor for the purpose of manufacturing child pornography is a Class 2 felony. The bill also provides that any person who receives any money or other valuable thing for or on account of causing any person to engage in forced labor or services, concubinage, prostitution, or the manufacture of any obscene material or child pornography is guilty of a Class 4 felony.
Title
Abduction of minors; for sexual purposes, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Sen. Charles Carrico [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Barbara Comstock [R] |
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Sal Iaquinto [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Jackson Miller [R] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 785 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1898ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1898ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-26 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | House: Conference substitute printed 11105660D-H3 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senators: McEachin, Quayle, Reynolds | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House: Delegates: Hugo, Albo, Watts | |
2011-02-24 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: House acceded to request | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House 11105383D-S1 (1-Y 95-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1898S1 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105383D-S1 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105383D-S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1898H2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105125D-H2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute rejected 11104885D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Incorporates HB1893 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105125D-H2 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2011-01-31 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-31 | House: Incorporates HB1893 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104885D-H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103525D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 382 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 47 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 48 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 49 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |