VA HB1897 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Summons for unlawful detainer; notice; adverse employment actions prohibited. Requires any summons for unlawful detainer to include a notice to the tenant that it is unlawful for his employer to discharge him from employment or take any adverse personnel action against him for appearing at an initial or subsequent hearing on such summons, provided that he has given reasonable notice of such hearing to his employer. Summons for unlawful detainer; notice; adverse employment actions prohibited. Requires any summons for unlawful detainer to include a notice to the tenant that it is unlawful for his employer to discharge him from employment or take any adverse personnel action against him for appearing at an initial or subsequent hearing on such summons, provided that he has given reasonable notice of such hearing to his employer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Summons for unlawful detainer; notice to tenant, adverse employment actions prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-25HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HousePrinted as engrossed 21102187D-E
2021-01-22HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1897E
2021-01-22HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-22HouseRead second time
2021-01-21HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102187D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801126(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback