VA HB1897 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Intercollegiate athletics programs. Prohibits the sum of school funds and student fees used to support intercollegiate athletics programs from exceeding a certain percentage of athletics revenues, as those terms are defined in the bill, at each four-year public institution of higher education in the Commonwealth. The bill requires any school that violates this prohibition to submit to the General Assembly a five-year plan for coming into compliance. The bill requires the Auditor of Public Accounts to monitor plan progress and provides that negative audits will trigger a reduction or elimination of existing operational authority. The bill also (i) requires the board of visitors of any four-year public institution of higher education that seeks to add a major intercollegiate athletics program or change the division level of any of its existing intercollegiate athletics programs to first submit to the Intercollegiate Athletics Review Commission established in the bill a plan and recommendations for financing the addition or change and (ii) prohibits any such addition or change from being implemented without the approval of the General Assembly expressed in the general appropriation act. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2016.
Title
Intercollegiate athletics programs; format for each institution to report revenues and expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 704 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1897ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference substitute printed 15105435D-H3 |
2015-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Norment, Howell, Watkins |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: Cox, Jones, Joannou |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-26 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 99-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1897H2 |
2015-01-22 | House | Substitute by Delegate Cox agreed to 15104095D-H2 |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee substitute rejected 15103864D-H1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-22 | House | Floor substitute printed 15104095D-H2 (Cox) |
2015-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 15103864D-H1 |
2015-01-19 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101204D |