VA HB1897 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Search of electronic device without warrant prohibited. Provides that no officer of the law or any other person shall search any cellular telephone, tablet computer, portable computer, desktop computer, or other electronic device containing or designed to contain electronic data or digital information except by virtue of and under a warrant issued by a proper officer.
Title
Cellular telephone or other electronic devices; warrant required for search.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2013-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103486D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1897 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1897+hil |