VA HB1895 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Nondisclosure or confidentiality agreements; prohibited nondisparagement provisions; claims of sexual harassment. Provides that no employer may require an employee or prospective employee to execute or renew any provision in a nondisclosure or confidentiality agreement, including any provision regarding nondisparagement, that has the purpose or effect of concealing the details of a sexual harassment claim. Any such provision is against public policy and is void and unenforceable. Nondisclosure or confidentiality agreements; prohibited nondisparagement provisions; claims of sexual harassment. Provides that no employer may require an employee or prospective employee to execute or renew any provision in a nondisclosure or confidentiality agreement, including any provision regarding nondisparagement, that has the purpose or effect of concealing the details of a sexual harassment claim. Any such provision is against public policy and is void and unenforceable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual harassment; nondisclosure or confidentiality agreement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
2023-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
2023-03-08SenateSigned by President
2023-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1895ER)
2023-03-07HouseEnrolled
2023-02-25HouseVOTE: Adoption (94-Y 1-N)
2023-02-25HouseConference report agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N)
2023-02-25SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-25 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2023-02-23SenateSenators: Saslaw, Deeds, Obenshain
2023-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2023-02-23HouseDelegates: Filler-Corn, Byron, Head
2023-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2023-02-22HouseHouse acceded to request
2023-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2023-02-21SenateSenate insisted on substitute (33-Y 7-N)
2023-02-20HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
2023-02-20HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 23106730D-S1 (0-Y 98-N)
2023-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-16SenatePassed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N)
2023-02-16SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1895S1
2023-02-16SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23106730D-S1
2023-02-16SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-16SenateRead third time
2023-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 23106730D-S1
2023-02-13SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2023-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N)
2023-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
2023-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1895H1
2023-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 23106173D-H1
2023-02-06HouseRead second time
2023-02-05HouseRead first time
2023-02-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 23106173D-H1
2023-02-03HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 1-N)
2023-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2023-02-01HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2023-01-31HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-01-31HouseReferred from Commerce and Energy by voice vote
2023-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-19HouseAssigned sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103054D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40127.3(n/a)See Bill Text
40128.01(n/a)See Bill Text
40128.02(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB1895
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1895+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1895H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1895S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1895ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0511+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23106119D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+HB1895AC
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1895F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1895FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1895FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1895FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H2301V0008+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0802V0076+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H08V0140+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1618+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S02V0128+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0505HB1895+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0536HB1895+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2055+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0665HB1895+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV1004HB1895+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2394+HB1895

Bill Comments

feedback