VA HB1895 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1895

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Fines and costs; accrual of interest; deferral or installment payment agreements. Provides that no interest shall accrue on any fine or costs imposed in a criminal case or in a case involving a traffic infraction (i) for a period of 180 days following the date of the final judgment imposing such fine or costs; (ii) during any period the defendant is incarcerated; and (iii) for a period of 180 days following the date of the defendant's release from incarceration if the sentence includes an active term of incarceration. Current law prohibits interest from accruing on such fines or costs for a period of 40 days from the date of the final judgement imposing such fine or costs or during any period the defendant is incarcerated. Fines and costs; accrual of interest; deferral or installment payment agreements. Provides that no interest shall accrue on any fine or costs imposed in a criminal case or in a case involving a traffic infraction (i) for a period of 180 days following the date of the final judgment imposing such fine or costs; (ii) during any period the defendant is incarcerated; and (iii) for a period of 180 days following the date of the defendant's release from incarceration if the sentence includes an active term of incarceration. Current law prohibits interest from accruing on such fines or costs for a period of 40 days from the date of the final judgement imposing such fine or costs or during any period the defendant is incarcerated. The bill also removes the requirement that a defendant be unable to make payment of a fine, restitution, forfeiture, or penalty and costs within 30 days of sentencing in order to be eligible to enter into a deferred or installment payment agreement and allows any defendant to enter such payment agreements. The bill provides that no fee shall be assessed in connection with a defendant's participation in a deferred or installment payment agreement and removes the requirement that a defendant make a down payment upon entering a deferred, modified deferred, or installment payment agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fines and costs; accrual of interest, deferral or installment payment agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (58-Y 41-N)
2021-02-02HousePrinted as engrossed 21102438D-E
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1895E
2021-02-02HouseCommittee on Appropriations amendment agreed to
2021-02-02HouseCommittee on Courts of Justice amendment agreed to
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-21HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2021-01-20HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102438D

Same As/Similar To

HB1895 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192353.5(n/a)See Bill Text
192355(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1895
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1895+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1895E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1895AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103393A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1895F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1895FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0801V0008+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08V0068+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0207V0004+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0071+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1379+HB1895
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03V0140+HB1895

Bill Comments

feedback