VA HB1894 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1894

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0181)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Certain employees of the Department of Juvenile Justice; naloxone or other opioid antagonist. Authorizes employees of the Department of Juvenile Justice designated as probation and parole officers or as juvenile correctional officers to possess and administer naloxone or other opioid antagonist for overdose reversal pursuant to an oral or written order or standing protocol issued by the prescriber within the course of his professional practice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naloxone or other opioid antagonist; certain employees of DJJ authorized to administer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0181)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 181 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1894ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-10SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-20HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-18HouseRead first time
2021-01-15HouseReported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned PS sub: Public Safety
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101928D

Same As/Similar To

HB1894 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413408(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1894
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1894+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1894ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0181+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1894F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1894FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H15C0002+HB1894
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC0979+HB1894
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0097+HB1894
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1502C0002+HB1894
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0057+HB1894
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB1894+HB1894
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0266HB1894+HB1894

Bill Comments

feedback