VA HB1894 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Certain employees of the Department of Juvenile Justice; naloxone or other opioid antagonist. Authorizes employees of the Department of Juvenile Justice designated as probation and parole officers or as juvenile correctional officers to possess and administer naloxone or other opioid antagonist for overdose reversal pursuant to an oral or written order or standing protocol issued by the prescriber within the course of his professional practice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naloxone or other opioid antagonist; certain employees of DJJ authorized to administer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-20HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-18HouseRead first time
2021-01-15HouseReported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned PS sub: Public Safety
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101928D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413408(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback