VA HB1893 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

New River Valley Passenger Rail Station Authority; creation. Authorizes the creation of a regional passenger rail station authority in Planning District 4 to assist in the creation and maintenance of passenger rail in the region. The authority would be authorized to enter into revenue sharing agreements and to issue revenue bonds. The authority would be governed by a board consisting of members of each participating locality and institution of higher education. New River Valley Passenger Rail Station Authority; creation. Authorizes the creation of a regional passenger rail station authority in Planning District 4 to assist in the creation and maintenance of passenger rail in the region. The authority would be authorized to enter into revenue sharing agreements and to issue revenue bonds. The authority would be governed by a board consisting of members of each participating locality and institution of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New River Valley Passenger Rail Station Authority; creation of authority in Planning District 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House (93-Y 7-N)
2021-01-27HousePrinted as engrossed 21100517D-E
2021-01-27HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1893E
2021-01-27HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-27HouseRead second time
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-14HouseReported from Transportation (19-Y 3-N)
2021-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100517D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3323800(n/a)See Bill Text
3323816(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1893
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1893+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1893E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1893AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103633A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1893F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1893FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1901V0004+HB1893
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H19V0010+HB1893
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0207V0001+HB1893
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0024+HB1893
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1228+HB1893
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S11V0036+HB1893

Bill Comments

feedback