VA HB1891 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1891
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Human Resource Management; duties of the Department; annual safety and disaster awareness training. Requires the Department of Human Resource Management, in coordination with the Secretary of Health and Human Resources or his designee, to develop an online training module addressing safety and disaster awareness, including information on public health safety. The bill also requires that all state employees complete the training annually. The bill requires such training to be incorporated into existing mandatory training. Department of Human Resource Management; duties of the Department; annual safety and disaster awareness training. Requires the Department of Human Resource Management, in coordination with the Secretary of Health and Human Resources or his designee, to develop an online training module addressing safety and disaster awareness, including information on public health safety. The bill also requires that all state employees complete the training annually. The bill requires such training to be incorporated into existing mandatory training.
Title
Annual safety and disaster awareness training; DHRM, et al., to develop an online training module.
Sponsors
Del. Hala Ayala [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1891H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103471D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103471D-H1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100789D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1891 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)