VA HB1890 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Collection of sales and use tax. Removes the exception that persons selling certain products, such as window shades, kitchen equipment, and countertops, are deemed to be retailers and not consuming contractors for purposes of collecting sales and use tax, even if they intend to install such items for contractors. Generally, tangible personal property incorporated into real property is deemed to have been purchased for consumption by the contractor. This bill is identical to SB 1308.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; collection of taxes from consuming contractors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-13 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
2017-03-13 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 436 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-21SenateSigned by President
2017-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1890ER)
2017-02-20HouseEnrolled
2017-02-15SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15SenateRead third time
2017-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-14SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-03HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02HouseRead second time and engrossed
2017-02-01HousePassed by for the day
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-30HouseReported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2017-01-20HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101981D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581610(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback