VA HB1890 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Retirement System; purchase of service credit for prior service. Makes numerous changes to the purchase of service credit program to simplify it and make it more cost-neutral to the Retirement System fund and more in line with other states' programs. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Retirement System; purchase of service credit for prior service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
2015-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 508 (effective 1/1/17)
2015-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-03-10HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
2015-03-07SenateSigned by President
2015-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-03-06HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1890ER)
2015-03-06HouseEnrolled
2015-02-27HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2015-02-27HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
2015-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2015-02-26HouseConference substitute printed 15105636D-H1
2015-02-26 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2015-02-25SenateSenators: Stuart, Wagner, Carrico
2015-02-25SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2015-02-25HouseDelegates: Jones, Poindexter, Hester
2015-02-25HouseConferees appointed by House
2015-02-25HouseHouse acceded to request
2015-02-24SenateSenate requested conference committee
2015-02-24SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2015-02-23HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
2015-02-23HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 15105185D-S1 (2-Y 96-N)
2015-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-02-19SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1890S1
2015-02-19SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 15105185D-S1
2015-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2015-02-19SenateRead third time
2015-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-17SenateCommittee substitute printed 15105185D-S1
2015-02-17SenateReported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2015-02-09SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2015-02-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2015-02-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2015-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2015-02-05HousePrinted as engrossed 15101211D-E
2015-02-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1890E
2015-02-05HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2015-02-05HouseRead second time
2015-02-04HouseRead first time
2015-02-02HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2015-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2015-01-21HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement
2015-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2015-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101211D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
511142.2(n/a)See Bill Text
511142.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1890
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1890+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1890E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1890S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1890H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1890ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0508+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H0202V0002+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H02V0022+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV1927+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S05V0264+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0559HB1890+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0615HB1890+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2631+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0751HB1890+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0985HB1890+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2901+HB1890

Bill Comments

feedback