VA HB1890 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of General Services; standard vendor accounting information. Requires the Division of Purchases and Supply of the Department of General Services and the State Comptroller to adhere to the adopted data standards and match all purchases of goods, commodities, and other services to the related payment activity and make the matched information available on the Commonwealth Data Point pursuant to subdivision H 3 a of § 30-133. The bill requires that this information be available at a transactional level and be in sufficient detail to make clear what an agency has purchased, when the purchase was made, the vendor from whom the purchase is made, the amount purchased, if applicable, and how much was paid. The bill further requires that by July 15, 2013, the Governor must direct the Division and State Comptroller to take the steps necessary to modify their systems to accomplish the requirements of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Services, Department of; public access to standard vendor accounting information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
2013-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 493 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-02-25SenateSigned by President
2013-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1890ER)
2013-02-23HouseEnrolled
2013-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-20SenateRead third time
2013-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-18SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N)
2013-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2013-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2013-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2013-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2013-01-24HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1890H1
2013-01-24HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 13104161D-H1
2013-01-24HouseRead second time
2013-01-23HouseRead first time
2013-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 13104161D-H1
2013-01-22HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2013-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
2013-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
2013-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2013-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102126D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221115.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1890
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1890+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1890H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1890ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+CHAP0493+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H1102V0003+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H11V0062+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV0254+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S12V0147+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0703HB1890+HB1890
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0748HB1890+HB1890

Bill Comments

feedback