VA HB1890 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Judicial retirement; mandatory retirement. Adjusts the mandatory retirement age under judicial retirement to age 73. Currently, judges are required to retire at age 70. This bill is a recommendation of the Judicial Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial retirement; mandatory retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 5-N) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-08 House: Left in Courts of Justice
2011-01-17 House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 5-N)
2011-01-14 House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
2011-01-11 House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2011-01-11 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100862D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
511305(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback